NY S03420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for child care assistance, and provided with such assistance, shall be able to utilize such assistance when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work non-traditional hours and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for assistance shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain up to eight hours of sleep, as needed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for child care assistance, and provided with such assistance, shall be able to utilize such assistance when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work non-traditional hours and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for assistance shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain up to eight hours of sleep, as needed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading cal.469
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a413a
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3420A
2019-06-05SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1002
2019-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

Same As/Similar To

A00413 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3420a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03420
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03420A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3420#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3420#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3420#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3420#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03420&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback