NY S03422 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the discharge of residents of a community residence; provides that nothing shall be deemed construed as creating a relationship of landlord and tenant between an operator of a community residence and a resident; defines community residence.
Title
Relates to the discharge of residents of a community residence; provides that nothing shall be deemed construed as creating a relationship of landlord and tenant between an operator of a community residence and a resident; defines community residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1933 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.659 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03465 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to mental health