NY S03427 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits state contracts with vendors that forbid employees from litigating discrimination or harassment claims except in the case of an emergency arising from certain unforeseen causes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits state contracts with vendors that forbid employees from litigating discrimination or harassment claims except in the case of an emergency arising from certain unforeseen causes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3427A
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.723
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A07936 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback