NY S03445 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3445A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3445A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs each community college to study the effectiveness of the current full time equivalent funding formula and alternatives thereto.
Title
Directs each community college to study the effectiveness of the current full time equivalent funding formula and alternatives thereto.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3445A |
2020-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1036 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |