NY S03450 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the display of a bus driver's credentials prominently while he or she is on duty and changes the review of his or her files by the department from every three years to annually.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.677
2019-05-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 3450B
2019-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 3450A
2019-05-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-02-07SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A02188 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - print number 2188b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03450
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03450A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03450&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03450B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3450#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3450#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3450#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback