NY S03458 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 3458A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires medical assistance coverage for medically tailored meals and medical nutrition therapy for the purpose of disease management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 3458A
2019-03-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-03-12SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-07SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02794 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - print number 2794b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback