NY S03476 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the not-for-profit corporation Jamison Road Fire Benevolent Association, Inc. for all persons who are now, or have been, or hereafter become active volunteers of the Jamison Road Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., in the county of Erie and who have acquired or shall hereafter acquire the status of exempt volunteer firefighter; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the not-for-profit corporation Jamison Road Fire Benevolent Association, Inc. for all persons who are now, or have been, or hereafter become active volunteers of the Jamison Road Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., in the county of Erie and who have acquired or shall hereafter acquire the status of exempt volunteer firefighter; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.366
2019-10-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.686
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6464
2019-05-29Assemblyreferred to local governments
2019-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.382
2019-02-07SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06464 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3476

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback