NY S03491 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.471
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires disclosure by principal creditors and debt collection agencies of the legal obligations of a deceased debtor's family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires disclosure by principal creditors and debt collection agencies of the legal obligations of a deceased debtor's family.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.471
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.309
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a4903a
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2017-06-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 3491A
2017-06-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2017-01-23SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A04903 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3491a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback