NY S03496 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Redes Art 16 & S16.01 to be Art 17 & S17.01, add Art 16 SS16.01 - 16.07, Arts & Cul L; add S411, RPT L; amd S1115, Tax L Provides an optional pilot program to establish arts-based districts in the cities of Buffalo, Rochester, Syracuse and Troy and for the repeal of the provisions pertaining thereto.
Title
Redes Art 16 & S16.01 to be Art 17 & S17.01, add Art 16 SS16.01 - 16.07, Arts & Cul L; add S411, RPT L; amd S1115, Tax L Provides an optional pilot program to establish arts-based districts in the cities of Buffalo, Rochester, Syracuse and Troy and for the repeal of the provisions pertaining thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | |
2009-05-05 | PRINT NUMBER 3496A | |
2009-05-05 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | |
2009-03-20 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A694-A (Same As) 2010-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means