NY S03505 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to immunity from civil liability and information furnished to or from the National Insurance Crime Bureau, which is dedicated to the investigation and prosecution of the banking law or the insurance law.
Title
Relates to immunity from civil liability and information furnished to or from the National Insurance Crime Bureau, which is dedicated to the investigation and prosecution of the banking law or the insurance law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.47 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.656 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.248 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3505A |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.237 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-08 | Senate | print number 3214a |
2019-04-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to banks |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3214A |
2019-04-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3505A |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.248 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03214 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.47