NY S03546 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the teen driver safety commission consisting of 12 members; requires the commission to study, examine and review the issue of teen driver safety; requires the commission to report its findings, conclusions and recommendations.
Title
Creates the teen driver safety commission consisting of 12 members; requires the commission to study, examine and review the issue of teen driver safety; requires the commission to report its findings, conclusions and recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1306 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06730 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation