NY S03546 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.
Title
Creates the rescued animals spay and neuter fund; authorizes the department of taxation and finance to place a check-off box on income tax returns for taxpayers to contribute money to the fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3546A |
2016-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00596 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS