NY S03549 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3549A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3549A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Title
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3549A |
2020-02-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01183 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means