NY S03557 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to impose higher civil penalties upon motor carriers who knowingly and negligently fail to report to the commissioner of motor vehicles certain disqualifying violations by bus drivers employed by such carrier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to impose higher civil penalties upon motor carriers who knowingly and negligently fail to report to the commissioner of motor vehicles certain disqualifying violations by bus drivers employed by such carrier.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.678
2019-05-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-08SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A02039 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback