NY S03563 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - signed chap.162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - signed chap.162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the anchoring of furniture and electronics in child day care centers and certain other facilities.
Title
Requires the anchoring of furniture and electronics in child day care centers and certain other facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.162 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.816 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3563A |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.272 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-25 | Senate | print number 29a |
2019-04-25 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A29A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.816 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3563A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00029 (Same As) 2019-08-13 - signed chap.162