NY S03564 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful possession of marihuana sentencing; provides for either a fine or community service.
Title
Relates to unlawful possession of marihuana sentencing; provides for either a fine or community service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3564B |
2017-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3564A |
2017-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06600 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes