NY S03576 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3576B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - PRINT NUMBER 3576B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2019 and thereafter to $35,000.
Title
Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2019 and thereafter to $35,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3576B |
2018-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3576A |
2018-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1451 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03327 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES