NY S03579 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3579A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3579A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "bail elimination act of 2018"; creates provisions for pretrial detention.
Title
Enacts the "bail elimination act of 2018"; creates provisions for pretrial detention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3579A |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05033 (Same As) 2018-04-09 - print number 5033a