NY S03582 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a consumer credit reporting agency to offer identity theft prevention and mitigation services in the case of a breach of the security of such agency's system.
Title
Relates to requiring a consumer credit reporting agency to offer identity theft prevention and mitigation services in the case of a breach of the security of such agency's system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.115 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.870 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3582 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-02-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.60 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2374 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.870 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02374 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - signed chap.115