NY S03592 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3592A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3592A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person with a master's of social work degree who meets certain requirements to file to be licensed within one year after the effective date of this act.
Title
Allows a person with a master's of social work degree who meets certain requirements to file to be licensed within one year after the effective date of this act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3592A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A11265 (Same As) 2018-07-25 - referred to higher education