NY S03599 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Title
Enacts the accessible electronic information act for blind and disabled persons; creates a new fund in the state finance law; authorizes a not-for-profit entity to administer the program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04590 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions