NY S03610 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that notice be given to the community boards when there is a change in service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities or the omnibus line facilities of the New York city transit authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that notice be given to the community boards when there is a change in service furnished upon the rapid transit facilities or the omnibus line facilities of the New York city transit authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-04-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-26SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.346
2019-03-26SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03322 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback