NY S03628 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables any city of one million or more to impose taxes on motor vehicles for transporting passengers, including medallion taxis, of four hundred dollars per vehicle.
Title
Enables any city of one million or more to impose taxes on motor vehicles for transporting passengers, including medallion taxis, of four hundred dollars per vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3628A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00845 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to cities