NY S03630 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3630A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3630A
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Title
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3630A |
2020-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04598 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in housing