NY S03634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a liability insurer may be sued for and the plaintiff may recover compensatory damages where the insurer failed to effectuate prompt and fair settlement of the claim and considered its interests to the detriment of the insured so as to cause the rendering of a judgment in excess of the policy limits.
Title
Provides that a liability insurer may be sued for and the plaintiff may recover compensatory damages where the insurer failed to effectuate prompt and fair settlement of the claim and considered its interests to the detriment of the insured so as to cause the rendering of a judgment in excess of the policy limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3634B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3634A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05629 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes