NY S03639 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires persons having claims under a life insurance policy to provide reasonable assistance to the insurer in obtaining information relating to misrepresentations made by the insured.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires persons having claims under a life insurance policy to provide reasonable assistance to the insurer in obtaining information relating to misrepresentations made by the insured.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.402
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a7664
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to insurance
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.665
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A07664 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s3639

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback