NY S03649 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing retired public employees who participated in World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations to seek subsequent employment with the state or a municipal corporation without diminution of retirement benefits.
Title
Relates to allowing retired public employees who participated in World Trade Center rescue, recovery or cleanup operations to seek subsequent employment with the state or a municipal corporation without diminution of retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3649B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3649A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07132 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - print number 7132c