NY S03655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - signed chap.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - signed chap.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations; makes certain provisions relating to such permanent.
Title
Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations; makes certain provisions relating to such permanent.
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | signed chap.41 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1003 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3655B |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-05-15 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.202 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-26 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-20 | Senate | print number 5841a |
2019-03-20 | Senate | amend and recommit to housing |
2019-02-20 | Senate | referred to housing |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5841A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1003 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3655B |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3655A |
2019-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05841 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - signed chap.41