NY S03656 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent and para-transit dependent representative on various transportation authorities.
Title
Requires the appointment of a transit dependent and para-transit dependent representative on various transportation authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.565 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.236 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06168 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions