NY S03658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Hartwick, Otsego county as the "Sergeant John Kempe Winslow Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Hartwick, Otsego county as the "Sergeant John Kempe Winslow Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.157 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.498 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6670b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1339 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3658B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3658A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06670 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.157