NY S03659 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Title
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.249 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1762 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3659 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.140 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.140 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-20 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5940 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1762 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05940 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled