NY S03682 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Title
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.419 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02885 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES