NY S03686 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing reverse cooperative apartment unit loans for persons sixty-two years of age or older; provides additional consumer protections.
Title
Relates to authorizing reverse cooperative apartment unit loans for persons sixty-two years of age or older; provides additional consumer protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.213 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.587 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2632b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1763 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3686B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3686A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A02632 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.213