NY S03688 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Title
Requires liability insurance rate reductions upon completion of a boating safety course or an advanced boating safety course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.41 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.335 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.205 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a5415a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.769 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3688A |
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05415 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.41