NY S03692 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employers from seeking salary history from prospective employees; establishes a public awareness campaign.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.196
2019-02-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 3692A
2019-02-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2019-02-12SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A05308 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6549

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback