NY S03697 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that contributions received by a candidate shall not be expended for goods or services provided by an entity in which the candidate and/or one or more members of the candidates family collectively hold a thirty-five percent or greater ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that contributions received by a candidate shall not be expended for goods or services provided by an entity in which the candidate and/or one or more members of the candidates family collectively hold a thirty-five percent or greater ownership.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.166
2019-02-12SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05486 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback