NY S03707 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
Pending: Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the proper venue for an impounding organization to file a petition for a security to be paid by the owner of a seized animal currently in the care of such organization.
Title
Relates to the proper venue for an impounding organization to file a petition for a security to be paid by the owner of a seized animal currently in the care of such organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.199 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A05552 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture