NY S03709 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a veterans' gerontological advisory committee.
Title
Establishes a veterans' gerontological advisory committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.845 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.515 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05147 (Same As) 2018-04-24 - held for consideration in aging