NY S03735 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the East Northport Fire District to apply for retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the East Northport Fire District to apply for retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.270 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1541 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3735B |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.270 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-28 | Senate | print number 5769a |
2019-05-28 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5769A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1541 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3735B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3735A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05769 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.270