NY S03747 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits officers or employees of a state agency, members of the legislature or legislative employees from committing acts of sexual harassment while serving in his or her official capacity.
Title
Prohibits officers or employees of a state agency, members of the legislature or legislative employees from committing acts of sexual harassment while serving in his or her official capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.503 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.635 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3747A |
2019-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |