NY S03754 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits employers from requiring certain conditions or preconditions of employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1060
2019-02-13SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05777 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - advanced to third reading cal.201

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback