NY S03756 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Title
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.177 |
2019-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a55 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1184 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00055 (Same As) 2019-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.177