NY S03763 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the penalty for larceny and criminal mischief during a declaration of a state of emergency by the governor, when committed within the geographical area where the state of emergency is in effect.
Title
Relates to increasing the penalty for larceny and criminal mischief during a declaration of a state of emergency by the governor, when committed within the geographical area where the state of emergency is in effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1001 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |