NY S03764 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a sentence of imprisonment for sex offenses where the victim of the offense lacked the ability to consent due to incapacity.
Title
Relates to requiring a sentence of imprisonment for sex offenses where the victim of the offense lacked the ability to consent due to incapacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1002 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |