NY S03780 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2688B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2688B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to solicitation used by or on behalf of any charitable organization.
Title
Relates to solicitation used by or on behalf of any charitable organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2688B |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1099 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3780B |
2018-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3780A |
2017-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02688 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.373