NY S03796 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 3796A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 3796A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Nurse of Tomorrow Act" to provide for grants from the state commissioner of education to public and not-for-profit hospitals, skilled nursing facilities, schools and other entities for nurse recruitment, education and retention costs and activities as described herein.
Title
Enacts the "Nurse of Tomorrow Act" to provide for grants from the state commissioner of education to public and not-for-profit hospitals, skilled nursing facilities, schools and other entities for nurse recruitment, education and retention costs and activities as described herein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3796A |
2020-02-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09817 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - referred to higher education