NY S03809 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6062A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6062A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assault on a New York city sanitation worker; provides that such assault is either a class C felony or constitutes assault in the second degree when such assault is by means of releasing or failing to control an animal with the intent to obstruct such person from performing their lawful duties.
Title
Relates to assault on a New York city sanitation worker; provides that such assault is either a class C felony or constitutes assault in the second degree when such assault is by means of releasing or failing to control an animal with the intent to obstruct such person from performing their lawful duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6062A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1455 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3809A |
2012-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06062 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - signed chap.377