NY S03809 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6325A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6325A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Title
Directs the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan transportation authority to report to the governor and the legislature on service reductions and eliminations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6325A |
2015-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3809A |
2015-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06325 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - tabled