NY S03809 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a restricted dental faculty license, makes such provisions permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a restricted dental faculty license, makes such provisions permanent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23AssemblySIGNED CHAP.401
2019-10-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.463
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a7674
2019-05-08Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-05-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.476
2019-02-15SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07674 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - substituted by s3809

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback