NY S03817 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a member shall forfeit his or her retirement rights and benefits if he or she is convicted of or pleads to certain crimes related to public employment.
Title
Provides that a member shall forfeit his or her retirement rights and benefits if he or she is convicted of or pleads to certain crimes related to public employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07222 (Same As) 2012-05-01 - held for consideration in governmental employees